Accounts and annual returns ASHBEACH LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1185810
Charity reporting is overdue by 1425 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 695 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 695 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1060 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1060 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 March 2022 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1425 days