Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE WESTERN BUDDHIST ORDER (CORWEN)

Charity Number: 514363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £190.00k £52.32k £92.46k £126.83k £162.48k
Total expenditure £210.00k £78.78k £87.49k £98.53k £134.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A