THE THOMAS FRANKS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of need amongst disadvantaged, (due to poverty or financial hardship, ill health or deprived social circumstances) children and young people for the public benefit, in particular by the award of grants which assist and support the development of children and young people,including to projects which undertake direct educational activity and food-based learning. England,Wales, Scotland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
760 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- Malta
- Portugal
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 September 2019: CIO registration
- T.T.F.F. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Catherine Bothwell | Chair | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD HELLINGS | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Leggett | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Gibson | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Cooper | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.59k | £213.09k | £213.81k | £146.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.89k | £166.70k | £221.07k | £131.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Sep 2019 as amended on 27 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST DISADVANTAGED ADULTS, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE AWARD OF GRANTS AND PROVISION OF SERVICES WHICH ASSIST AND SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, PROVIDE RELIEF, SUPPORT AND OPPORTUNITY TO ADULTS, INCLUDING PROJECTS WHICH UNDERTAKE DIRECT EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITY AND FOOD-BASED LEARNING. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE "DISADVANTAGED" MEANS PERSONS WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED DUE TO POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL HEALTH OR DEPRIVED SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thomas Franks Ltd
The Stables
Brewery Lane
Hook Norton
BANBURY
OX15 5NX
- Phone:
- 01608738070
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window