LINCOLNSHIRE PROFICIENCY TEST COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of LPTC shall be advancement of education and training by means of collaboration with City & Guilds Land Based Services in the administration and provision of certificates of competence in practical agriculture, horticulture and forestry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 November 1983: Standard registration
- LINCOLNSHIRE PROFICIENCY TESTS COMMITTEE (Working name)
- LPTC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Brian James Reginald Foster | Chair | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ann Eileen Dickinson | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hammond | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WRAY | Trustee | 23 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Simon Gadd | Trustee | 23 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Mark Ireland | Trustee | 23 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Neil Rowbottom | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK LEGGOTT | Trustee |
|
||||||
STUART GEOFFREY SUDDABY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW BAXTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.53k | £75.07k | £124.25k | £113.16k | £111.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.09k | £78.59k | £118.67k | £115.69k | £109.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 1982
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY MEANS OF COLLABORATION WITH THE NATIONAL PROFICIENCY TESTS COUNCIL IN THE ADMINISTRATION AND PROVISION OF PROFICIENCY TESTS IN PRACTICAL AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE WITHIN THE COUNTY.
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MILL FARM
MOORHOUSES
NEW BOLINGBROKE
BOSTON LINCOLNSHIRE
PE22 7LG
- Phone:
- 01205481018
- Email:
- karenhobsonfarm@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window