T.A.S.C.A.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TASCA is a voluntary run support group for families with children (0-18yrs) living in the Tameside area with Autism, social and communication difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tameside
Governance
- 20 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janice Venn | Chair | 01 June 2000 |
|
|
||||
Maria Carty | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Karen Walch | Trustee | 01 June 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.99k | £763 | |
|
Total expenditure | £914 | £3.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.99k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 12 June 2023 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 19 April 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST THOSE YOUNG PEOPLE, THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF A DISABILITY OR LEARNING DIFFICULTY THROUGH, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A) OFFERING SUPPORT TO FAMILIES AND CARERS OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM AND SOCIAL AND COMMUNICATION RELATED DISORDERS BEFORE, DURING AND AFTER DIAGNOSIS B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF AUTISM BY SHARING KNOWLEDGE AND WORKING WITH THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND LOCAL ORGANISATIONS SUCH AS SCHOOLS ETC. C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jubilee Gardens
Gardenfold Way
Droylsden
Manchester
M43 7XU
M43 7XU
- Phone:
- 07754873480
- Email:
- tascatameside@outlook.com
- Website:
-
tascatameside.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window