SOCIO-LEGAL STUDIES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Socio-Legal Studies Association is a learned society for Socio-Legal Studies. Its objects are for the public benefit to advance education and learning in the field of socio-legal studies and to promote research, the useful results of which shall be published for the public benefit, teaching and the dissemination of knowledge in the field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 November 2019: CIO registration
- SLSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alexander Powell | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andra le Roux-Kemp | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kay Louise Lalor | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kirsten McConnachie | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Alexander Giles Green | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raza Saeed | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marie Anne Hutton | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marie Patricia Burton | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elisabeth Rachel Griffiths | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Laurence Howard | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Bryson | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Craven | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Beverley Ann Clough | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mitchell James Travis | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Emma Jane Jones | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Colin Moore LLB | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Flacks | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Harrington | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Milne | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Smita Kheria | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Moosavian | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Bremner | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.11k | £37.39k | £149.96k | £71.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.37k | £41.09k | £55.36k | £80.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEARNING IN THE FIELD OF SOCIO LEGAL STUDIES AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH SHALL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TEACHING AND THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE FIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cardiff University
Sbarc Spark
Maindy Road
CARDIFF
CF24 4HQ
- Phone:
- 029 2087 4098
- Email:
- Harringtonj3@cardiff.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window