Accounts and annual returns AL-INSAAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1188617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 September 2024 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 September 2024 308 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 September 2024 673 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 September 2024 673 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2024 1038 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 September 2024 1038 days late Download Open in new window