NO OUTSIDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No outsiders prepares children for life in modern Britain where they can live and work alongside anyone regardless of race, religion, sex, sexual orientation, age, gender reassignment or disability. No Outsiders charity provides a 7 year programme to be taught in primary schools with the aim of building community cohesion and prevent children being drawn into terrorism and far right activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Wearing | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Sarah Miller | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ROBBINS | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.73k | £10.89k | £47.08k | £24.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.96k | £7.56k | £36.42k | £35.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, TRAINING AND INFORMATION TO SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
No Outsiders
PO Box 1354
Cheltenham
GL50 9GZ
- Phone:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window