THE PENTECOSTAL CITY MISSION CHURCH (WILLESDEN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND THE COMMUNITY BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS. C) TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY AND GOOD RACE RELATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £69,353 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 January 2020: CIO registration
- 12 July 2022: Funds received from 1131745 THE PENTECOSTAL CITY MISSION CHURCH (WILLESDEN)
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Desmond Agustus Hall | Chair | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Odeth McKenzie | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Simon Hall | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Maureen Hall | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.45k | £158.35k | £141.68k | £101.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.08k | £146.45k | £139.44k | £87.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £68.75k | £52.30k | £12.00k | £69.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT AND IN SUCH WAYS IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT INCLUDING WORK IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE INTERNATIONAL PENTECOSTAL CITY MISSION (ALSO REFERRED TO AS PENTECOSTAL CITY MISSION INC); 4.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, CARE AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN IN THEIR EARLY YEARS TO PROVIDE A SECURE FOUNDATION FOR FUTURE LEARNING AND ENHANCE THE LIFE CHANCES OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS, WHOSE OPPORTUNITIES ARE CONSTRAINED BY ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE BY FACILITATING ACCESS TO TRAINING, SUPPORT AND GUIDANCE WHICH ADVANCE THE SKILLS, KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATIONAL ATTAINMENT NEEDED TO ACHIEVE THEIR FULL INDIVIDUAL POTENTIAL IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pentecostal City Mission Church
(Willesden ) Mission House
6 Craven Park Harlesden
London
NW10 8SY
- Phone:
- 02089657296
- Email:
- reception@pcmc.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window