MAHESHWARI MAHASABHA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Hindu religion as professed and practiced by the Maheshwari Community (the community) in UK and elsewhere, advancement of education, the relief of poverty, and promotion of health in the united kingdom, and elsewhere, promotion of good relations between different racial groups for the benefit of the community as a whole cultural, sporting and religious activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 May 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sameer Baheti | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deepak Kabra | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kavita Pungliya | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
LOKESHKUMAR BADRILAL CHECHANI | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MADHUSUDAN SATYANARAYAN KABRA | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.71k | £15.92k | £29.83k | £50.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.43k | £26.30k | £27.54k | £38.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
"THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION AS PROFESSED AND PRACTICED BY THE MAHESHWARI COMMUNITY (THE COMMUNITY) OF THE UK AND ELSEWHERE MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF PROVIDING CULTURAL AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES FOR SUCH ACTIVITIES. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND PROMOTION OF HEALTH IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE. THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
211 Station Road
HARROW
Middlesex
HA1 2TP
- Phone:
- 07448804971
- Email:
- info@mmuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window