2ND SCARBOROUGH EARL OF LONDESBOROUGHS OWN SCOUT GROUP (ELO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout group based at a scout hut providing weekly volunteer run sessions obtaining badges and awards in all areas of scouting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER LYNDA POTTAGE | Chair | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Peckitt | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN BULL | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|||||
FREDERICK ANDERSON | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.20k | £22.49k | £7.30k | £9.83k | £8.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.00k | £7.16k | £7.44k | £16.07k | £15.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.00k | £17.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 August 2024 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL; AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 MOUNT VIEW AVENUE
SCARBOROUGH
YO12 4EW
- Phone:
- 07835934802
- Email:
- lynzi17864@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window