Governing document WELLINGTON THEATRE COMPANY
Charity number: 514385

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27 JULY 1983 AS AMENDED 31 AUGUST 1983,28 JULY 1988,20 JULY 1989,18 JULY 1990 AND 11 AUGUST 1992.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF DRAMA AND THE THEATRE IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PLAYS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.