Sutton Village Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sutton Village Church is an Independent Methodist Church which provides weekly Christian centred services for all ages. Our Sunday Service is a time of sung worship and bible teaching, which runs alongside a Sunday School provision for younger members. During the week and throughout the year, we host a variety of activities and events for the benefit of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- St Helens
Governance
- 03 July 2019: Standard registration
- HERBERT STREET INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH (Working name)
- SUTTON VILLAGE CHURCH (Previous name)
- Sutton Village Church (Previous name)
- TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH HERBERT STREET INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Taylor | Chair | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pyke | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
June Tyrer | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anita Robinson | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Milow | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Appleton | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Williams | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Cooper | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Appleton | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.23k | £7.84k | £17.65k | £21.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.31k | £8.28k | £14.24k | £23.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUN 2019 as amended on 12 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE INDEPENDENT METHODIST CONNEXION. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUTTON VILLAGE CHURCH
HERBERT STREET
ST. HELENS
WA9 3LE
- Phone:
- 0
- Email:
- svillagechurch@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window