STANWELL FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve financial hardship and to promote and preserve good health amongst the general public in Stanwell and surrounding area by providing fund, food,goods and services of any kind as deemed appropriate by the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £24,240 from 2 government contract(s) and £24,240 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carley Egan | Chair | 10 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Linda Gay Millin | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Diane Birungi Pyres | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Goodacre | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jane Walton | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.97k | £74.86k | £183.40k | £176.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.22k | £77.10k | £127.58k | £192.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.24k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £61.15k | £38.85k | £24.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN STANWELL AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD AND ESSENTIAL HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 ELSINORE AVENUE
STAINES-UPON-THAMES
TW19 7SX
- Phone:
- 07429584286
- Email:
- anna0151@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window