UGIRI COMMUNITY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ugiri Community Service actively seeks ways to educate the society on health and education related matters. The organisation searches for opportunities to give back to the communities in the UK and Nigeria through education promotion and health awareness activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Nigeria
Governance
- 26 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Felix Egwim | Chair | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mercy Adangozi Chukwunyere | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bruno Chibuzo Obasi | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Chioma Obi-Nwagwu | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Okechukwu Destiny Obialo | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Okechukwu Emeagi | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
IKECHUKWU ANYANWU | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.71k | £473 | £421 | £644 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.85k | £4.39k | £120 | £360 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2022 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2022 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE NIGERIAN BY BIRTH OR DESCENT, IN PARTICULAR FROM UGIRI IN IMO STATE OF NIGERIA NOW LIVING IN THE UK AND PEOPLE LIVING IN UGIRI IMO STATE OF NIGERIA BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; AND (C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 WEST WAY
CROYDON
CR0 8RD
- Phone:
- 02084717182
- Email:
- ugiri.uk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window