RUNHAM WILDLIFE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a wildlife and domestic rescue where we rehabilitate the sick and injured back into the wild, our sanctuary or forever homes. We educate people into biodiversity and the importance of the ecosystem with tours, talks and work experience in order to teach future generations the necessary need for wild animals and responsible domestication of non wild pets..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 December 2019: CIO registration
- RUNHAM WILDLIFE RESCUE (Working name)
- RWR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Wolmer | Chair | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maryna Drobot | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Murfet Miss | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Susan Barrat | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.46k | £24.79k | £22.43k | £24.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.80k | £26.77k | £23.01k | £23.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 14 September 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | 14 September 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 11 September 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 11 September 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF ANIMAL WELFARE, ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES AND BIODIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heath Farm
Market Lane
Filby
NR29 3ST
- Phone:
- 07506430246
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window