PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. LUKE & ST. JOHN, CHELTENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC is primarily focused on the advancement of religion, which is recognised as a charitable purpose having public benefit. All regular public worship is provided free of charge and open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 10 July 2019: Standard registration
- ST. LUKE'S PCC, CHELTENHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PATRICK EDWARD WHEATON | Chair | 28 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Robert Bolton | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Rod Woodward-Court | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL SMITH | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Fenton-Jones | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wingfield | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Harris | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Giles Wadsworth | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carla Thraves | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Lodge | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Victoria Perona-Wright | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Burke | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Ralphs | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Beevers | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.91k | £127.87k | £126.40k | £160.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.46k | £127.84k | £135.00k | £148.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. LUKES CHURCH
ST. LUKES ROAD
CHELTENHAM
GL53 7JJ
- Phone:
- 01242241910
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window