MALDON MUSEUM IN THE PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the history of Maldon and the local district by providing and maintaining a museum and by protecting, conserving and displaying artefacts and items from the collections held by the museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 03 October 2019: CIO registration
- 12 December 2022: Funds received from 301362 THE MALDON DISTRICT MUSEUM ASSOCIATION
- MALDON MUSEUM (Working name)
- MITP (Working name)
- MMITP (Working name)
- MUSEUM IN THE PARK (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GRANT ANDERSON | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jeary | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|||||
DAVID PATIENT | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEITH DONALD JEARY | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN GEORGE CRUICKSHANK | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £7.65k | £6.81k | £10.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £6.72k | £9.15k | £10.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.88k | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF MALDON AND THE LOCAL DISTRICT BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A MUSEUM AND BY PROTECTING, CONSERVING AND DISPLAYING ARTEFACTS AND ITEMS FROM THE COLLECTIONS HELD BY THE MUSEUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Mill Road
MALDON
CM9 5HX
- Phone:
- 01621842688
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window