THE NAZARETH WAY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the work of chaplaincy at HMP Send and other prisons in England and Wales and provides grants against certain criteria to prisoners at HMP Send and other prisons in England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 October 2019: CIO registration
- 26 June 2020: Funds received from 1160099 THE NAZARETH WAY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Gloster | Chair | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Philip Stanbrook | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Halsey | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bayliss | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Leslie Ronald Smith | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Joyce Leclerq | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.00k | £52.04k | £21.83k | £20.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.23k | £9.43k | £21.11k | £40.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £100 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF PERSONS WHO ARE PRESENTLY DETAINED, HAVE PREVIOUSLY BEEN DETAINED OR ARE AT RISK OF BEING DETAINED IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING RESOURCES AND SUPPORT FOR THE WORK OF PRISON CHAPLAINCIES ACROSS ENGLAND AND WALES; (B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE PRESENTLY DETAINED, HAVE PREVIOUSLY BEEN DETAINED OR ARE AT RISK OF BEING DETAINED IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADVICE, MENTORING, EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO ASSIST IN THE REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS; (C) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE PRESENTLY DETAINED, HAVE PREVIOUSLY BEEN DETAINED OR ARE AT RISK OF BEING DETAINED IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND AMONGST THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO OFFENDERS IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO CHARITIES PROVIDING FINANCIAL RELIEF TO THEIR FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOORE BARLOW LLP
THE ORIEL
SYDENHAM ROAD
GUILDFORD
GU1 3SR
- Phone:
- 01932351220
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window