HOLDERNESS COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make known the Christian gospel by evangelistic outreach and social action and to donate money both to relieve poverty and encourage outreach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 October 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIVIENNE HUBBARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ELAINE BENNINGTON | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE SUSAN BAKER | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.55k | £23.29k | £31.08k | £23.31k | £26.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.01k | £27.59k | £27.74k | £24.92k | £26.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 JULY 1983
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH THE PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL IN THE TOWNSHIPS OF WITHERNWICK, LEVEN AND HORNSEA AND IN ANY NEARBY VILLAGES AND PLACES IN THE COUNTRY OF HUMBERSIDE AND THROUGOUT THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lake View Lodge
Hull Road
Hornsea
HU18 1RW
- Phone:
- 01964533485
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window