BRITISH BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1185343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

British Beekeepers' Association is a membership charity with 26,000 members. Learning and participation are at our core. We achieve this by promoting the enjoyment and appreciation of beekeeping and by nurturing young people in the importance of bees and other vital pollinating insects. We support research projects and lobby government on funding for honey bee research.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 September 2019: CIO registration
  • 14 August 2020: Funds received from 212025 BRITISH BEE KEEPERS' ASSOCIATION
  • 14 August 2020: Funds received from 212025 BRITISH BEE KEEPERS' ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BRITISH BEE KEEPERS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Diane Drinkwater Chair 13 January 2018
None on record
Gary Raymond Clueit Trustee 11 January 2025
None on record
Christopher Toby Chapman-Dawe Trustee 13 January 2024
None on record
Alan Rowse Trustee 13 January 2024
None on record
Phillip Rogers Trustee 13 January 2024
None on record
Luke Whyatt Trustee 13 January 2024
THE LONDON BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Warwick Newson Trustee 13 January 2024
DEVON BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Richard Oliver Trustee 13 January 2024
None on record
David Mark Hunter Trustee 14 January 2023
JACKDAWS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
AVON BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Clare McGettigan Trustee 15 January 2022
None on record
Dr Jane Medwell Trustee 15 January 2022
None on record
Joyce Irene Nisbet Trustee 11 January 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £812.69k £870.84k £1.00m £995.34k £1.03m
Total expenditure £774.49k £800.14k £907.20k £1.02m £1.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.56k £5.81k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £151.04k £90.39k £73.14k £72.73k £69.87k
Income - Other trading activities £2.50k £1.14k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £657.60k £778.75k £924.56k £906.37k £925.68k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.56k £574 £3.09k £16.24k £35.30k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £752.86k £787.66k £886.85k £1.00m £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.63k £12.48k £0 £0 £17.41k
Expenditure - Governance £51.11k £21.86k £33.75k £30.41k £38.78k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £20.35k £14.99k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Own use assets £261.39k £418.45k £394.80k £343.21k £302.24k
Long-term investments £342.00k £350.31k £282.89k £495.24k £555.50k
Other assets £700.45k £643.65k £731.81k £563.55k £565.03k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £315.11k £97.50k £58.43k £69.60k £68.14k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 12 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 12 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
British Beekeepers Association
Unit 176
Avenue J
Stoneleigh Park
KENILWORTH
Warwicks
Phone:
02476696679