BLAYDON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further or benefit the residents of the Blaydon and surrounding wards of Gateshead, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or political, religious or other opinions in the provision of services to advance education and to provide facilities and services for the delivery of social welfare, recreation and leisure time, with the objective of improving the conditions of life for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £28,172 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
Governance
- 11 November 2019: CIO registration
- 09 March 2022: Funds received from 520735 BLAYDON YOUTH CLUB
- BYCC (Working name)
- BLAYDON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE PROJECT CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIA THERESA HALL | Chair | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
julie vincent | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Dorothy Burnett | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Victor Connaughton | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £263.85k | £274.96k | £354.95k | £344.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £259.00k | £246.29k | £284.19k | £309.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £76.26k | £41.77k | £43.49k | £28.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BLAYDON AND SURROUNDING WARDS OF GATESHEAD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blaydon Youth & Community Centre
Shibdon Road
BLAYDON-ON-TYNE
Tyne And Wear
NE21 5LU
- Phone:
- 01914147849
- Email:
- info@blaydonycc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window