SCIENTIAE

Charity Number: 1188145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advance the education of the public in the subject of early modern knowledge, in particular but not exclusively through the provision of an annual conference

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £17,965
Total expenditure: £19,712

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Austria
  • Canada
  • Italy
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Stefano Gulizia Chair 25 October 2022
None on record
Dr Leonie Katherine Hannan Trustee 20 October 2023
None on record
Dr David Beck PhD Trustee 20 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £2.16k £3.86k £0 £17.97k
Total expenditure £647 £3.11k £259 £19.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 22 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lytchett House
Unit 13
Freeland Park
Wareham Road
Lytchett Matravers
POOLE
Phone:
07949742031