LIVERTON MINES VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a community building for hire to people of the village for activities such as bingos, meetings, parties and surgeries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 06 November 1983: Standard registration
- LIVERTON MINES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC MICHAEL JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY LANIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.63k | £3.21k | £5.00k | £3.25k | £5.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.77k | £2.81k | £4 | £2.31k | £3.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 558 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 923 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 923 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1288 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1288 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1653 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1653 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JUNE 1983
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF LIVERTON MINES IN THE PARISH OF LOFTUS IN THE COUNTY OF CLEVELAND WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDGIN USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LIVERTON MINES, LOFTUS, CLEVELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Liverton Mines Community Centre
Low Cleveland Street
Liverton
Saltburn-by-the-Sea
TS13 4QY
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- chrisswales47@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
stmartinsclose.livertonmines
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window