NORFOLK HOUSE

Charity number: 1186539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of bursaries and donations toward the education of pupils at Norfolk House School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £2,400
Total expenditure: £2,400

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN GERALD CHALLINOR Chair 22 November 2019
None on record
HAYLEY ADEL FOX Trustee 22 November 2019
None on record
SUSANNAH FRANCES PALMER Trustee 22 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £0 £2.40k £2.40k £2.40k
Total expenditure £0 £2.40k £2.40k £2.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 09 October 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 09 October 2023 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 16 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 16 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 20 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 20 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NORFOLK HOUSE SCHOOL
4 NORFOLK ROAD
EDGBASTON
BIRMINGHAM
B15 3PS
Phone:
07939272454
Website:

No information available