LIGONIER MINISTRIES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity seeks to advance the Christian faith by proclaiming, teaching and defending the holiness of God in all its fullness to as many people as possible. To help achieve this the charity focuses in three areas: publishing, broadcasting and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Edward Larson | Chair | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARK GARDINER JOHNSTON | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Joel Morris | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £0 | £7.80k | £7.05k | £1.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.63k | £6.99k | £12.14k | £8.77k | £4.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Oct 2019 as amended on 31 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Union School of Theology
Bryntirion House
Bryntirion
BRIDGEND
CF31 4DX
- Phone:
- +44 (20) 39700398
- Email:
- legal@ligonier.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window