CHRIST REVIVAL MIRACLE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the christian faith for the benefit of the public through the holdings of meetings, lectures, producing and distibuting christian literature to enlighten others about christianity and through broadcasting evangelistic and teaching messages; establish and run churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 November 2019: CIO registration
- CHRIST REVIVAL MIRACL CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GANIYU MUHAMMED ABDULLAHI | Chair | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY OLAJUMOKE SOLOMON | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
OLUBUNMI HENRIETTA ADEYEMO | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
TOLUWANI FAITH OWA | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.04k | £8.65k | £6.95k | £6.06k | £5.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.34k | £600 | £2.60k | £4.78k | £3.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING CHRISTIAN LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIANITY AND THROUGH BROADCASTING EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING MESSAGES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 CURNICK'S LANE
LONDON
SE27 0UT
- Phone:
- 01951031700
- Email:
- cremic.london@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window