Financial history NAVENBY PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 514422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.72k £30.07k £43.26k £70.38k £52.30k
Total expenditure £64.41k £29.65k £49.64k £64.48k £63.75k
Income from government contracts £15.28k £3.88k £7.82k £34.74k £7.50k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A £750