Trustees LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ALEXANDRA HOSPITAL
Charity number: 1184967

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YVONNE LEE | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MICHAEL WARING | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN COX | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WILSON | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HENRY CHRISTOPHER BEARD | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL RICHARD SPENCER | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|||||
ROSEMARY CHRISTINE DIXON | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GEORGE HILSON | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.