UFULU MALAWI LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ufulu is a UK charity whose aim is to end period poverty among women and girls in Malawi. We run educational workshops on menstrual hygiene and provide free sanitary products, namely reusable menstrual cups. We educate young girls on menstrual and feminine hygiene and provide ongoing support networks for both women and girls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Malawi
Governance
- 06 August 2019: Standard registration
- UFULU (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WILLIAM CUTTS | Chair | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michele Rousseau | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Gray | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Frances Crosbie | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Louise Jane Robinson | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexia Woolsey | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.03k | £15.49k | £53.61k | £74.48k | £32.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.37k | £20.61k | £25.64k | £90.86k | £44.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG WOMEN AND GIRLS ANYWHERE IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA, STARTING IN MALAWI, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SANITARY PRODUCTS SUCH AS MOONCUPS OR SUSTAINABLE, WASHABLE, REUSABLE PADS WHERE THEY ARE NEEDED. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN MALAWI AND SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA IN THE SUBJECT OF MENSTRUATION AND SANITARY PROTECTION AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE ECONOMIC, SOCIAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACTS OF PERIOD POVERTY IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA AND TO MAKE RESULTS OF THIS RESEARCH AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE ÔPERIOD POVERTYÖ MEANS A LACK OF ACCESS TO SANITARY PRODUCTS DUE TO FINANCIAL CONSTRAINTS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 HEATH DRIVE
BINFIELD HEATH
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 4LX
- Phone:
- 01189464666
- Email:
- widgew@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window