Accounts and annual returns EBENEZER CHURCH, TALBOT GREEN

Charity number: 1188571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 March 2022 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 March 2022 54 days late Download Open in new window