THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS NORTHALLERTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objectives are to cooperate with the Parochial Church Council in the preservation and maintenance of the church, its fabric and furnishings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 November 1983: Standard registration
- 01 October 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 01 October 2021: Funds transferred to 1131285 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
- FRIENDS OF NORTHALLERTON PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.58k | £5.58k | £3.47k | £3.25k | £8.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £869 | £2.27k | £41.27k | £13.75k | £8.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 01 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 23 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/08/1983
Charitable objects
TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL IN THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCH, ITS FABRIC AND FURNISHINGS, AND TO PROMOTE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE BUILDING, ITS HISTORY AND ITS WORK; AND FOR THOSE WHO HAVE AN INTEREST AND REGARD FOR THE ANCIENT PARISH CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS, NORTHALLERTON.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NORTHALLERTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window