Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FOUR SAINTS
Charity number: 1186540

Charity reporting is up to date (79 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Edward Smith | Chair | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Seve | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Martin Roberts | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Guest | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Elizabeth Collins | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Darling | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Kate Kerley | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Stukey | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Vivian | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nina Patricia Laing | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Graham Ward Nettleton | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Bicknell | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Renate Louisa Christina Tulloh | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lorraine Kingsley | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert John Sawdy Dr. | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Apperley | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Lilian Driver | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alun Williams | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Vivien Dorothy Kingston | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Crewe | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Edward Barham | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Eugene Jennings | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Michael Sharp | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
India Marie Farrow | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Lane Williams | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Vanessa Fursdon | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Margaret Gillis | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.