MATER ECCLESIAE COLLEGE

Charity number: 1186431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Since 17th July 2019, Mater Ecclesiae College has conducted the Ecclesiastical Faculties of Theology and Philosophy at St Mary's University in Twickenham. These were the Faculties formerly conducted by Heythrop College in London and most recently known as the Bellarmine Institute. The Faculties provide courses leading to the ecclesiastical degrees, up to Doctorate level, in Theology & Philosophy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE BELLARMINE INSTITUTE (Working name)
  • THE HEYTHROP FACULTIES OF THEOLOGY AND PHILOSOPHY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Right Reverend JOHN FRANCIS SHERRINGTON Chair 01 August 2019
THE PONTIFICAL BEDA COLLEGE, ROME TRUST FUND
Received: On time
The Very Revd Professor Paul Gerard McPartlan Trustee 28 October 2024
None on record
The Most Reverend Mark Anthony O'Toole Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
The Very Reverend Doctor Simon George Gaine OP Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
The Most Reverend Bernard Longley Trustee 01 August 2019
BIRMINGHAM CHURCHES TOGETHER
Received: On time
THE BRITISH TRUST FOR THE ECUMENICAL INSTITUTE FOR ADVANCED THEOLOGICAL STUDY IN JERUSALEM
Received: On time
MARYVALE INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Birmingham Newman University
Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Received: On time
The Most Reverend John Wilson Trustee 01 August 2019
ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK
Received: 49 days late
BUTLER TRUST
Received: On time
MRS C J I B GORDON-CANNING'S PRIESTS' TRUST (LONDON)
Received: On time
THE BLUNDELL CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
WEDGEWOOD ENDOWMENT ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)
Received: On time
WOODROFFE BEQUEST ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)
Received: On time
THE ALLENBY ENDOWMENT IN CONNECTION WITH CRAYFORD R C SCHOOL
Received: On time
DEPTFORD POOR FUND
Received: On time
DUFFY BEQUEST
Received: On time
REDMOND'S CHARITY
Received: On time
HAYNES BEQUEST
Received: On time
HOWARD OF GLOSSOP BEQUEST
Received: On time
DE SAMPAYO BEQUEST
Received: On time
DUKE OF NORFOLK TRUST
Received: On time
HONORA TURNER O'CALLAGHAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
ROBINSON BEQUEST
Received: On time
CANON TIERNEY TRUST
Received: On time
WILLIAMS SOUTHWARK FUND
Received: On time
WHITTINGHAM BEQUEST
Received: On time
SOUTHWARK TAYLOR EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S SEMINARY CIO
Received: On time
CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK AND ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON
Received: On time
THE VENERABLE ENGLISH COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
THE VALLADOLID TRUST FUND
Received: On time
The Most Reverend Malcolm Patrick McMahon OP Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Professor Gavin Gregory D'Costa Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £60.00k £60.00k £60.00k £0
Total expenditure £60.00k £60.00k £60.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 16 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 16 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MATER ECCLESIAE COLLEGE
St. Mary's University
Waldegrave Road
TWICKENHAM
TW1 4SX
Phone:
02082401030