GEMFIELDS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) the prevention or relief of poverty by providing grants and awards to charities and/or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty; and (2) the advancement of animal welfare and the conservation and protection of wildlife and natural habitats by providing grants and awards to charities and/or other organisations working in the field of wildlife protection.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Ethiopia
- Madagascar
- Mozambique
- South Africa
- Zambia
Governance
- 07 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIPPE EDOUARD BRUNO LAMBLIN | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD JOHNSON | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Emily Dungey | Trustee | 16 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sixtus Mulenga | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHA GOYAL | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sean Gilbertson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samora Machel | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.54k | £90.45k | £166.83k | £13.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.24k | £47.30k | £191.72k | £68.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO CHARITIES AND/OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; AND (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE AND THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WILDLIFE AND NATURAL HABITATS BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO CHARITIES AND/OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN THE FIELD OF WILDLIFE PROTECTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GEMFIELDS FOUNDATION
1 Cathedral Piazza
LONDON
SW1E 5BP
- Phone:
- 02075183400
- Email:
- foundation@gemfields.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window