VICTORIOUS CHRIST AMBASSADORS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN OXFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) PROVIDING A REGULAR PLACE OF WORSHIP AND PRAYER; B) THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES AS ARE APPROPRIATE FOR THE CHURCH, TO ENABLE IT TO FULFILL ITS MISSION TO THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH, VISITORS TO THE CHURCH AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Obeng | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIJAH BUABENG MBA | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Angenu | Trustee | 08 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 January 2025 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2025 | 436 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2025 | 443 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 January 2025 | 808 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2022 | 358 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1300 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN OXFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO BY: A) PROVIDING A REGULAR PLACE OF WORSHIP AND PRAYER; B) THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES AS ARE APPROPRIATE FOR THE CHURCH, TO ENABLE IT TO FULFIL ITS MISSION TO THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH, VISITORS TO THE CHURCH AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY; C) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN TRAINING AND SERVICE; D) THE SUPPORT AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN EVANGELISM AND OUTREACH; E) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO THE WIDER CHRISTIAN CHURCH IN ITS MINISTRIES. F) UNDERTAKING OTHER ACTIVITIES THAT ARE CONSISTENT WITH PROMOTING CHRISTIANITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 OSPREY PLACE
DIDCOT
OX11 6BX
- Phone:
- 07412579032
- Email:
- Elijahbuabeng@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window