SAMUEL LEEDS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding raising to provide funds to church activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 29 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Leeds | Chair | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA LEEDS | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Leeds | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL LEEDS | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £1.33k | £106.29k | £288.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.20k | £4.54k | £104.95k | £156.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND AFRICA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kings Head House
15 London End
Beaconsfield
Beaconsfield
HP9 2HN
- Phone:
- 03300100742
- Email:
- accounts@samuelleeds.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window