THE 'WEST MIDLANDS' SURGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the science and art of surgery in all its branches and to promote and encourage for the public benefit within the area covered by the West Midlands Regional Authority, the study, general practice and general knowledge of surgery
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDY GARNHAM | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.55k | £392 | £1.91k | £8.65k | £9.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.28k | £3.57k | £6.19k | £3.36k | £5.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 August 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCTOBER 1983
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENCE AND ART OF SURGERY IN ALL ITS BRANCHES AND TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE AREA COVERED BY THE WEST MIDLANDS REGIONAL HEALTH AUTHORITY, THE STUDY, GENERAL PRACTICE AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF SURGERY.
Area of benefit
AREA COVERED BY WEST MIDLANDS REGIONAL HEALTH AUTHORITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Stoke University Hospital
Newcastle Road
Stoke-on-Trent
ST4 6QG
- Phone:
- 01905763333
- Email:
- deborahnicol@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
wmsurgeons.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window