JAMIAT AHL-E HADITH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Jamiat Ahl _E Hadith is the Muslim Worship place. The five daily prayers, Friday prayers, Taraweeh and Eid Prayers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derby City
Governance
- 11 September 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED YOUSAF | Chair |
|
|
|||||
IFRAHIM KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED AYUB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YASER MAHMOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHAFIQ AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.72k | £15.79k | £14.17k | £21.52k | £20.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.93k | £21.38k | £15.36k | £16.47k | £16.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2024 | 345 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 DECEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE TO PROMOTE THE MUSLIM FAITH AND MUSLIM CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN THE AREA OF DERBY AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT EXPAND AND DEVELOP A SCHOOL AND MOSQUE FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
DERBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
JAME MASJID & ISLAMIC CENTRE
7-7A HASTINGS STREET
DERBY
DE23 6QQ
- Phone:
- 01332294888
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window