MACKAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees shall hold the Capital and Income of the Trust Fund upon trust to apply the income, and all or such part or parts of the capital, at such time or times and in such manner to, or for the benefit of, such exclusively charitable objects and purposes in any part of the world as the Trustees may in their discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shane Lyle Mackay | Chair | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Ruthven Gemmell WS | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Mary Mackay | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.01k | £10.01k | £5.00k | £5.06k | £278 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.72k | £6.75k | £2.56k | £3.02k | £2.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS 3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT. 3.2 NOTWITHSTANDING THE PROVISIONS OF SUB-CLAUSE 3.1, THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY INVESTMENTS AUTHORISED BY THIS DEED OR BY LAW AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Murray Beith Murray
1-3 Glenfinlas Street
Edinburgh
EH3 6AQ
- Phone:
- 01312251200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window