EARLS BARTON LIBRARY AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public Library Service and related Community Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
39 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 10 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Martin Adams | Chair | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
IONA DENISE FLANAGAN | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Hilary Hillman | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert Eric Watts Mr | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Lesley Palot-Watts | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER EDWARD MORRALL | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Poole | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pollyanna Hadman | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Watkins | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245 | £6.26k | £12.45k | £17.38k | £23.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.18k | £6.20k | £12.85k | £36.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF EARLS BARTON AND SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY PLUS RELATED COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES FOR RECREATION AND OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Broad Street
Earls Barton
Northamptonshire
NN6 0ND
- Phone:
- 01604 368216
- Email:
- eblandcc@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window