Trustees SMART WORKS LEEDS
Charity Number: 1184676

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Elizabeth Fletcher | Chair | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ally Dowsing-Reynolds | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Reid | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Clarke | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Illingworth | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliette louise Fitzmaurice | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Louise Smith | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clare Oldham | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Frances Cherry | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.