ROSEHILL METHODIST SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Club is located in Littleover Lane, Derby, DE23 6JL providing sports, fellowship and social activities for its members and the community. Cricket, Crown Green Bowls and Tennis are played at the ground. New members are always welcome. Bowls and Tennis are played recreationally with senior cricket played in the Derbyshire County League. Cricket is also available for juniors aged 5 - 17 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Goodall | Chair | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Buckner | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Brenda Forest | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Anthony Randle | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Scott | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Iqbal Khan | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Edward Warren | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jean Dean | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Sharpe | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christabel Mary Muller | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul William Ferra | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sharpe | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marion Cowling | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Anne Getliffe | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.24k | £28.46k | £20.41k | £20.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.50k | £9.83k | £21.09k | £21.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.67k | £1.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET, CROWN GREEN BOWLS AND TENNIS PLUS SOCIAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE MEMBERS OF THE CIO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
114 JUBILEE ROAD
SHELTON LOCK
DERBY
DE24 9FD
- Phone:
- 07843864833
- Email:
- michaelsharpe114@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window