THE LEAGUE OF INTRAPRENEURS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work for the public benefit, to relieve poverty, advance equality, promote the preservation of the environment, and sustainable means of achieving economic growth and regeneration, in particular: a) providing education and training to social intrapreneurs; b) conducting and publishing research into social intrapreneurs c) promote organizational involvement with social intrapreneurship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Brazil
- Canada
- Chile
- France
- Germany
- Kenya
- Mexico
- Peru
- Scotland
- South Korea
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 26 May 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Justin Patrick Koszmovszky | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Sophie Sawday | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Florencia Estrade Cendan | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gilbert James Buchanan Bulloch | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite De Pree | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.90k | £290.69k | £293.07k | £174.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.61k | £168.76k | £320.15k | £246.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 January 2022 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 MAY 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUSTAINABLE BUSINESS PRACTICE AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY A) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING; B) CONDUCTING AND PUBLISHING RESEARCH; AND C) EXTENDING THE SUM OF KNOWLEDGE. IN THIS CLAUSE 2, "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT GENERATION WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WHITE HOUSE
MILL ROAD
GORING
READING
RG8 9DD
- Phone:
- +19713031980
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window