WEST MIDLANDS FIRE ENGINE PRESERVATION GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RESTORATION AND DISPLAY OLD FIRE ENGINES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 07 November 1983: Standard registration
- 08 April 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 April 2009: Funds transferred to 1093387 FIRE FIGHTERS CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.16k | £450 | £1.13k | £0 | £2.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £876 | £785 | £1.63k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 04 March 2009 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 22 October 2008 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 05 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 13 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 26 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 AUGUST 1982 AMENDED 12 APRIL 1983 AND 18 OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED 14 APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
TO RESTORE, PRESERVE, OPERATE AND EXHIBIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC VINTAGE FIRE ENGINES OF HISTORICAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window