DARLINGTON FOOTBALL CLUB FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Football and other sporting activities in the community - Promote physical health and mental wellbeing - Support growth of sports clubs - Support other community activities in our area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Darlington
- Durham
- North Yorkshire
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 23 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Rose | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Dobinson | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Portas | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Thompson B.E.M. | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Jeffrey Boggon | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sajna Syeda Ali | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Appleton Brown O.B.E. | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £12.49k | £58.52k | £66.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.59k | £6.62k | £46.87k | £60.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF DARLINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS: 3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.3 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 3.4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND OTHER PERSONS INCLUDING ACADEMIC, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; AND 3.5 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Darlington Football Club
Blackwell Meadows
Grange Road
Darlington
DL1 5NR
- Phone:
- 07425232102
- Email:
- neil.raper@darlingtonfc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window