MALPAS VINTAGE MACHINERY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meetings in Cheshire/Shropshire/Wrexham area. Annual Yesteryear Steam & Vintage Rally. Ploughing/Hedging Contest. Occasional Ploughing Training, etc. Support other Vintage Equipment/Educational Charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Shropshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 11 November 1983: Standard registration
- MALPAS YESTERYEAR RALLY (Working name)
- MVMA (Working name)
- YESTERYEAR RALLY (Working name)
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN RAYMOND BLACKWELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Richard Webb | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason James Henry Lindsay | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Gosmore | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN LITTLER | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Barratt | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CHARLES LANGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.40k | £1.40k | £1.40k | £85.53k | £95.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.13k | £8.09k | £5.09k | £52.53k | £87.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 DECEMBER 1982 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 23 AUGUST 1983.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING AND MAINTAINING INTEREST IN I) HISTORIC MACHINERY INCLUDING FAIR ORGANS AND EQUIPMENT AND AGRICULTURAL MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT. II) HISTORIC MECHANICALLY PROPELLED VEHICLES INCLUDING TRACTION ENGINES, STEAM ROLLERS AND OTHER STEAM VEHICLES. III) HISTORIC CRAFTS AND CRAFTMANSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Ffordd Dyfed
Rhosllanerchrugog
WREXHAM
LL14 2ES
- Phone:
- 07947644598
- Email:
- TimLittler@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window