STREET TREES FOR LIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
STfL plants over 200 street trees across the London Borough of Lewisham annually. We publicise and raise funds to support Lewisham Council's street tree planting scheme and liaise with the Council on behalf of residents. We work closely with schools and community groups to assist in sourcing local sponsorship and creating green corridors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £57,801 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie McGeevor | Chair | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hale | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Bagnall | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Greg Packmam | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raj Joneja | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Claire Goddard | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Xanthe Mosley | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.16k | £49.98k | £117.75k | £224.59k | £181.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.40k | £42.19k | £55.29k | £91.38k | £234.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.75k | £57.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL ENHANCEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE SPACES IN SUCH LONDON BOROUGHS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, BY THE PLANTING OF TREES AND SECURING THEIR GUARDIANSHIP. 2) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BY ENCOURAGING TREE PLANTING IN PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE SPACES IN SUCH LONDON BOROUGHS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE TO INCREASE BIODIVERSITY AND PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF A HEALTHY RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN TREES AND HUMANS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stephen Lawrence Centre
39 Brookmill Road
London
SE8 4HU
- Phone:
- 07968172120
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window