PRAIZIN' HANDS PUPPET GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have three puppet teams. One team put on presentations in schools supporting the PSHE curriculum such as Internet Safety, Bullying etc. helping children and young people to make positive choices. Our second team do presentations in schools, care homes, hospices to share the Christmas and Easter stories. Our third youth team lead church services and take part in community fun days.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel John Eyres | Chair | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maryanne Timandra Isobella Kitcherside | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cary Elizabeth Joyce | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverly Jayne Eyres | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Stephen Ridout | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.78k | £7.90k | £11.44k | £13.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.57k | £8.55k | £10.37k | £13.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PREDOMINANTLY IN THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND USING PUPPETRY AND CREATIVE ARTS IN AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE, WORKING WITH PEOPLE OF ALL AGES FROM CHURCHES, SCHOOLS AND COMMUNITIES. DEVELOPING THE SKILLS OF BOTH THE YOUTH AND ADULT PUPPET TEAMS THROUGH TRAINING AND TEAMWORK. TO PRESENT SECULAR EDUCATIONAL PUPPETRY PRESENTATIONS WORKING WITH SCHOOLS AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AS WELL AS ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY COVERING SOCIAL ISSUE TOPICS THAT MAY AFFECT THEIR LIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 TORMEAD
HYTHE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 5AW
- Phone:
- 07842142269
- Email:
- nigel@praizinhands.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window