CLAPTON FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friday Muslim Prayer sessions at the community hall. supplementary and home work tuition class at the week end Saturdays and Sundays two hours sessions. elderly and pensioners club two days a week Friday and Saturday Advice information and guidance on issues effecting the people lives (IAG sessions)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Obaidul Hoque | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zillur Rahman | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOTHAHIR ALI | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEIKH RUMMAN AHMED | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.77k | £5.33k | £10.91k | £10.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.16k | £2.71k | £7.84k | £5.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PASTORAL SUPPORT AND FORUMS, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, INTERFAITH ACTIVITIES AND RAISING AWARENESS OF ISLAM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. 2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
196 DAUBENEY ROAD
LONDON
E5 0ED
- Phone:
- 07913921886
- Email:
- claptonforum@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window